Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Cenicela, O.F.M. Disc. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

Note/Previous Titular See: (Bernardo de L’Immacolata Concezione)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1748Born
19 Dec 177224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Friars Minor
24 Oct 179749.0SelectedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
18 Dec 179749.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
21 Dec 179749.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy
17 Sep 181465.9DiedArchbishop of Reggio Calabria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Cenicela
Archbishop Giuseppe Maria Cenicela O.F.M. Disc. (born , died ) Archbishop of Reggio Calabria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuardia Sanframondi

  • a priest for 41.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 356
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast