Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Campanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Perugia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1747BornMatelica
13 Jan 177123.5Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 179648.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
3 Jul 179649.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
23 Sep 180558.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Perugia, Italy
30 Jul 181871.0DiedBishop of Perugia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Campanelli:
Archbishop Camillo Campanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Perugia

  • a priest for 47.5 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 105
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 303

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014