Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Camillo Cattaneo della Volta

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

Note/Previous Titular See: (de’ Marchesi di Monte Scaglioso)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1750BornNapoli
19 Mar 177423.4Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179747.0SelectedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
18 Dec 179747.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
21 Dec 179747.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
13 Mar 183483.4DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Cattaneo della Volta:
Archbishop Camillo Cattaneo della Volta (born , died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1834
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 64
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015