Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Annibale Di Leo

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jun 1739BornSan Vito dei Normanni
5 Jun 176222.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Oct 179758.3SelectedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
29 Jan 179858.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
2 Feb 179858.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
13 Feb 181474.6DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Annibale Di Leo
Archbishop Annibale Di Leo (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,968
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1798, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Mar 2016