Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Torrusio

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1758BornCannalonga
10 Mar 178122.8Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179739.4SelectedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
18 Dec 179739.6ConfirmedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
21 Dec 179739.6Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio, Italy
29 Oct 180446.4AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
24 Mar 182364.8DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Torrusio
Bishop Vincenzo Torrusio (born , died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 285
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016