Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Garzillo

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1756BornSolofra
19 Feb 178023.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179741.0SelectedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
18 Dec 179741.1ConfirmedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
21 Dec 179741.1Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
18 Jun 181861.6SelectedBishop of Bovino, Italy
2 Oct 181861.9ConfirmedBishop of Bovino, Italy
21 Mar 183275.3SelectedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
2 Jul 183275.6ConfirmedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
24 Jul 184588.7DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Paolo Garzillo
Bishop Paolo Garzillo (born , died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

  • a priest for 65.4 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1838
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 278
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 117, and Page 353
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016