Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Cordella

Deceased

Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1738³BornFermo
23 Mar 176526.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 178950.7AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
19 Apr 178950.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
7 Jan 181273.5DiedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Cordella
Bishop Martino Cordella (born , died ) Bishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 114
  • bp: CB, 6 Nov 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1789, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 13 Feb 2016