Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvatore de Lucia

Deceased

Bishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1748Born
6 Mar 177324.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Oct 179748.8SelectedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
18 Dec 179748.9ConfirmedBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy
21 Dec 179748.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carinola (Calina), Italy

MicroData Summary for Salvatore de Lucia
Bishop Salvatore de Lucia (born ) Bishop of Carinola (Calina)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMugnano

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,808, Page 131
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 140
  • c34: CB, 22 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,797, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast