Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Speranza

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1746BornLaurito
6 Mar 177326.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jan 179851.6AppointedBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
2 Feb 179851.6Ordained BishopBishop of Guardialfiera (Guardia), Italy
29 Oct 180458.4AppointedBishop of Capaccio, Italy
12 Aug 183488.2DiedBishop of Capaccio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Speranza:
Bishop Filippo Speranza (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,968
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 132

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013