Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Gazzoli

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

Titular Bishop of Forum Flaminii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1903BornEdolo
14 Feb 192622.5Ordained PriestPriest of Brescia, Italy
3 Feb 196864.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
3 Feb 196864.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Flaminii
19 Mar 196864.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Flaminii
6 Aug 198380.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brescia, Italy
17 Feb 199086.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Gazzoli:
Bishop Pietro Gazzoli (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brescia

  • a priest for 64.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1991, Page 1,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013