Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Nguyên Văn Viên

Auxiliary Bishop of Vinh

Titular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jan 1965 BornHuong Phuong
3 Oct 199934.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vinh, Viet Nam
15 Jun 201348.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
15 Jun 201348.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari
4 Sep 201348.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Megalopolis in Proconsulari

MicroData Summary for Pierre Nguyên Văn Viên:
Bishop Pierre Nguyên Văn Viên (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Vinh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vinh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 27 Jun 2013
  • c2+: CB, 4 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 5 Sep 2013