Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nguyễn Thi Hợp, O.P.

Bishop of H Tĩnh, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1945 Born
8 Aug 197227.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 May 201065.2AppointedBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
23 Jul 201065.4Ordained BishopBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
22 Dec 201873.8AppointedBishop of H Tĩnh, Viet Nam
11 Feb 201974.0InstalledBishop of H Tĩnh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyễn Thi Hợp
Bishop Paul Nguyễn Thi Hợp O.P. (born ) Bishop of H Tĩnh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLang Anh, Nghe An
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Xa Doi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of H Tĩnh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,763
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2018
  • i: CB, 13 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Aug 2020

Quantcast