Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Nguyên Năng

Bishop of Phát Diệm, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1953 Born
9 Jun 199036.5Ordained PriestPriest of Xuân Lộc, Viet Nam
25 Jul 200955.6AppointedBishop of Phát Diệm, Viet Nam
8 Sep 200955.7Ordained BishopBishop of Phát Diệm, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph Nguyên Năng
Bishop Joseph Nguyên Năng (born ) Bishop of Phát Diệm

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhuc Nhac

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Phát Diệm.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast