Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Marie Cao nh Thuyn

Bishop Emeritus of Vinh


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1927 BornTrang Luu
14 May 196033.4Ordained PriestPriest of Vinh, Viet Nam
6 Jul 199265.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
19 Nov 199265.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
11 Dec 200073.9SucceededBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam
13 May 201083.3RetiredBishop of Vinh, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie Cao nh Thuyn:
Bishop Paul-Marie Cao nh Thuyn (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Vinh

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Vinh.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,984

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013