Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Joseph-Marie Cardinal Trinh van-Can

Deceased

Archbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1921Born
8 Dec 194928.7Ordained PriestPriest of H Nội, Viet Nam
5 Feb 196341.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
5 Feb 196341.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aela
2 Jun 196342.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Aela
27 Nov 197857.6SucceededArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam
30 Jun 197958.2Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197958.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
18 May 199069.1DiedArchbishop of H Nội, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Marie Trinh van-Can
Joseph-Marie Cardinal Trinh van-Can (born , died ) Archbishop of H Nội

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrac But

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
  • a cardinal for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 6 Oct 2017