Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thadde Anselme Le Huu Tu, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Daphnusia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1897Born
22 Dec 192831.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
14 Jun 194547.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
14 Jun 194547.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Daphnusia
29 Oct 194548.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Daphnusia
1959²61.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Pht Dim, Viet Nam
24 Apr 196769.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim, Viet Nam

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thadde Anselme Le Huu Tu
Bishop Thadde Anselme Le Huu Tu O. Cist. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Pht Dim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDi-Loan

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations piscopales, Issue 1945, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast