Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Vinh

Dioecesis Vinhensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Hà Nôi
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 30,594 (11,816 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, Xa Doai, Nghi Dien, Nghi Loc, Nghe An, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (038)3861.171
  • Fax: 3861.676

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale}
27 March 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Vinh
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Tonking {Tonkino Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Vinh
Diocese of Vinh
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Vinh Diocese of Vinh

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Vinh
1963156,1951171171,33564135ap1971
1979264,0003,300,0008.0%95952,778185137ap1991
1999429,5284,929,5288.7%99994,338153151ap2000
2000421,5634,822,3938.7%1081083,903168143ap2001
2001417,8904,984,0008.4%1111113,764201151ap2002
2003446,3004,984,0009.0%1241243,599214144ap2004
2004453,0185,766,0007.9%1261263,595338143ap2005
2010492,9716,155,0008.0%15831613,0613697179ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 5 Sep 2013