Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Bùi Văn Đoc

Deceased

Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1944Born
17 Dec 197026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
26 Mar 199954.3AppointedBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
20 May 199954.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
28 Sep 201368.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
28 Sep 201368.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
22 Mar 201469.3SucceededArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
24 Apr 201469.4InstalledArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam
30 Aug 201469.8CeasedApostolic Administrator of Mỹ Tho, Viet Nam
6 Mar 201873.3DiedArchbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville), Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Bùi Văn Đoc
Archbishop Paul Bùi Văn Đoc (born , died ) Archbishop of Thành-Phô Hồ Chí Minh (Hôchiminh Ville)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceĐà Lạt
Ordained BishopIn Front of,, Cathedral, Đà Lạt, Diocese of Đà Lạt
Death PlaceSan Camillo, Hospital, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,557
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Sep 2013
  • s: Bollettino, 22 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 24 Apr 2014
  • d: CB, 6 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast