Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Miroudot Du Bourg, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1722BornVesoul, France
15 Apr 177653.6AppointedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
23 Jun 177653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
13 Apr 179168.6RemovedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
24 May 179875.7DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Miroudot Du Bourg: VIAF:51250493
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Miroudot Du Bourg O. Cist. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015