Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Joseph Perreau

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Tricomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1722Born
17 Jul 177553.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tricomia
13 Aug 177553.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tricomia
31 Jan 180582.9DiedTitular Bishop of Tricomia

MicroData Summary for Pierre Joseph Perreau
Bishop Pierre Joseph Perreau (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Tricomia

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoligny, Jura, France

  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 34
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 416

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast