Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Mussinghoff

Bishop Emeritus of Aachen, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1940 Born
29 Jun 196827.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
12 Dec 199454.1AppointedBishop of Aachen, Germany
11 Feb 199554.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aachen, Germany
8 Dec 201575.1RetiredBishop of Aachen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Mussinghoff
Bishop Heinrich Mussinghoff (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Aachen

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsterwick
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aachen, Diocese of Aachen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aachen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Number 12,487
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Dec 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast