Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Zekorn

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1959 Born
8 Oct 198425.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
3 Dec 201051.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
3 Dec 201051.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania
13 Feb 201151.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Stefan Zekorn
Bishop Stefan Zekorn (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDatteln

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Münster.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2010
  • tit/ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,951

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast