Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfred Melzer

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Titular Bishop of Carinola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1944 Born
1 Feb 197227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 Jun 199551.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
9 Jun 199551.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Carinola
10 Sep 199551.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carinola
5 Jun 201571.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Manfred Melzer
Bishop Manfred Melzer (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolingen
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,606
  • r: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2015
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast