Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Aufderbeck

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1909BornHellefeld
28 Mar 193627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
19 Jun 196253.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
19 Jun 196253.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
5 Sep 196253.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia
23 Jul 197364.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany
17 Jan 198171.8DiedApostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hugo Aufderbeck:
Bishop Hugo Aufderbeck (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Erfurt-Meiningen

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 135

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Feb 2014