Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wolfgang Weider

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Berlin

Titular Bishop of Uzita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1932 BornBerlin
21 Dec 195725.1Ordained PriestPriest of Berlin, Germany
10 Feb 198249.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
10 Feb 198249.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzita
25 Mar 198249.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzita
18 Feb 200976.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wolfgang Weider:
Bishop Wolfgang Weider (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Berlin

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Berlin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2009

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015