Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Peter Kohlgraf

Bishop-Elect of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1967 Born
18 Jun 199326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Apr 201750.0AppointedBishop of Mainz, Germany
27 Aug 201750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Kohlgraf (VIAF: 72287133)
Father Peter Kohlgraf (born ) Bishop-Elect of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Mainz, Diocese of Mainz

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Mainz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2017
  • ob: MW, 25 Apr 2017
  • c2+: CB, 8 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 May 2017