Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Norbert Trelle

Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1942 Born
2 Feb 196825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Mar 199249.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Mar 199249.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Egnatia
1 May 199249.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Egnatia
29 Nov 200563.2AppointedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
11 Feb 200663.4InstalledBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
9 Sep 201775.0RetiredBishop of Hildesheim, Germany

MicroData Summary for Norbert Trelle (VIAF: 35637342)
Bishop Norbert Trelle (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Hildesheim

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKassel
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Hildesheim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Nov 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,770
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Sep 2017