Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Heiner Koch

Archbishop of Berlin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1954 BornDüsseldorf
13 Jun 198026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 200651.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
17 Mar 200651.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
7 May 200651.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ros Cré
18 Jan 201358.5AppointedBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
16 Mar 201358.7InstalledBishop of Dresden-Meißen (Meissen), Germany
8 Jun 201560.9AppointedArchbishop of Berlin, Germany
19 Sep 201561.2InstalledArchbishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Heiner Koch:
Archbishop Heiner Koch (born ) Archbishop of Berlin

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Berlin.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,153
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2013
  • i: MW, 19 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 19 Jul 2015