Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefan Heße (Hesse)

Archbishop of Hamburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Aug 1966 Born
18 Jun 199326.8Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
28 Feb 201447.5AppointedAdministrator of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
20 Sep 201448.1ResignedAdministrator of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
26 Jan 201548.4AppointedArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
14 Mar 201548.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stefan Heße (Hesse) (VIAF: 308211425)
Archbishop Stefan Heße (Hesse) (born ) Archbishop of Hamburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hamburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 26 Jan 2015
  • c2+: CB, 24 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,385

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017