Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedhelm Hofmann

Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1942 Born
3 Feb 196926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jul 199250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
25 Jul 199250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Taddua
13 Sep 199250.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Taddua
25 Jun 200462.1AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
19 Sep 200462.3InstalledBishop of Würzburg, Germany
18 Sep 201775.3RetiredBishop of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedhelm Hofmann (VIAF: 64796452)
Bishop Friedhelm Hofmann (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln-Lindenthal, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Köln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Würzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,925
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 28 Feb 2018