Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André-Jean-Baptiste Pioger

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1897Born
17 Dec 192124.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 195557.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Jan 195557.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tremithus
25 Mar 195557.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tremithus
31 Mar 196163.8AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Jul 197174.1RetiredBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
22 Apr 198183.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for André-Jean-Baptiste Pioger
Bishop André-Jean-Baptiste Pioger (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlençon

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast