Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Yves-Maria Guy Dubigeon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1927Born
12 Oct 195225.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
29 Jun 195326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
22 Aug 198659.3AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
12 Oct 198659.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
25 Apr 200274.9RetiredBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
24 Jun 200780.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}, France

MicroData Summary for Yves-Maria Guy Dubigeon (VIAF: 73852841)
Bishop Yves-Maria Guy Dubigeon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Séez, Diocese of Sées {Séez}
Death PlaceNantes, Diocese of Nantes
Buried Place (Original)Notre-Dame, Cathedral, Séez, Diocese of Sées {Séez}

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 8 Jul 2018

Quantcast