Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Ireland

Deceased

Archbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1838BornBurnchurch, Ireland
21 Dec 186123.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
12 Feb 187536.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA
12 Feb 187536.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Maronea
28 Jul 187536.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
21 Dec 187537.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
31 Jul 188445.9SucceededBishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
15 May 188849.7AppointedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
25 Sep 191880.0DiedArchbishop of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for John Ireland:
Archbishop John Ireland (born , died ) Archbishop of Saint Paul

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 369, and Page 445

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013