Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alexander Christie

Deceased

Archbishop of Oregon City, Oregon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1848BornHighgate, VT, USA
22 Dec 187729.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
26 Mar 189849.8AppointedBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
29 Jun 189850.1Ordained BishopBishop of Vancouver Island, USA
4 Mar 189950.8AppointedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
15 Jun 189951.0InstalledArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
6 Apr 192576.9DiedArchbishop of Oregon City, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Alexander Christie:
Archbishop Alexander Christie (born , died ) Archbishop of Oregon City

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 427, and Page 582

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013