Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy J. Corbett

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota

Titular Bishop of Vita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1858BornMendota, MN
12 Jun 188627.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
9 Apr 191051.7AppointedBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
19 May 191051.9Ordained BishopBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
25 Jun 193880.0RetiredBishop of Crookston, Minnesota, USA
25 Jun 193880.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
20 Jul 193981.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Crookston, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Timothy J. Corbett:
Bishop Timothy J. Corbett (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crookston

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013