Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Busch

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1866BornRed Wing, MN
28 Jul 188923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
9 Apr 191044.0AppointedBishop of Lead, South Dakota, USA
19 May 191044.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lead, South Dakota, USA
19 Jan 191548.8AppointedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
21 Feb 191548.8InstalledBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA
31 May 195387.1DiedBishop of Saint Cloud, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Busch:
Bishop Joseph Francis Busch (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Cloud

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013