Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Benedict Kucera

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, Nebraska


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1888BornWheatland, MN
8 Jun 191526.8Ordained PriestPriest of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
30 Jun 193041.8AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
28 Oct 193042.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
9 May 195768.7DiedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Louis Benedict Kucera:
Bishop Louis Benedict Kucera (born , died ) Bishop of Lincoln

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013