Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James John Keane

Deceased

Archbishop of Dubuque, Iowa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1856BornJoliet, IL
23 Dec 188226.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
4 Aug 190245.9AppointedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
28 Oct 190246.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
11 Aug 191155.0AppointedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA
2 Aug 192972.9DiedArchbishop of Dubuque, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for James John Keane:
Archbishop James John Keane (born , died ) Archbishop of Dubuque

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 199
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1902, Number 60

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013