Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Fargo, North Dakota


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1855BornLisgrea, Ireland
24 Jun 188024.7Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 190954.1AppointedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
19 May 191054.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA
19 Dec 193479.1DiedBishop of Fargo, North Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for James O’Reilly:
Bishop James O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Fargo

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015