Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Richard Heffron

Deceased

Bishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1860Born
22 Dec 188424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
4 Mar 191049.7AppointedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
19 May 191049.9Ordained BishopBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA
23 Nov 192767.4DiedBishop of Winona, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Richard Heffron
Bishop Patrick Richard Heffron (born , died ) Bishop of Winona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast