Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Curtis John Guillory, S.V.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Beaumont, Texas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1943 Born
16 Dec 197229.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
29 Dec 198744.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Galveston-Houston, Texas, USA
29 Dec 198744.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Stagnum
19 Feb 198844.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Stagnum
2 Jun 200056.7AppointedBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
28 Jul 200056.9InstalledBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA
9 Jun 202076.7RetiredBishop of Beaumont, Texas, USA

MicroData Summary for Curtis John Guillory
Bishop Curtis John Guillory S.V.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Beaumont

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMallet
Ordained BishopSam Houston Coliseum, Houston, Diocese of Galveston-Houston, Texas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Beaumont.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,611
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • bd: CB, 2 Jan 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 22 Aug 2020

Quantcast