Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patrick Aloysius Cardinal O’Boyle

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

Cardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jul 1896Born
21 May 192124.8Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
29 Nov 194751.3AppointedArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
14 Jan 194851.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
21 Jan 194851.5InstalledArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
26 Jun 196770.9Elevated to Cardinal
29 Jun 196770.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Nicola in Carcere
3 Mar 197376.6RetiredArchbishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
10 Aug 198791.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Aloysius O’Boyle (VIAF: 55325421)
Patrick Aloysius Cardinal O’Boyle (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Washington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScranton, PA, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceProvidence, Hospital, Washington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Buried Place (Original)St. Francis of Assisi Chapel, St. Matthew the Apostle, Cathedral, Washington, Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.5 years
  • a cardinal for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 3
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Jun 1967

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 19 Sep 2018

Quantcast