Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Michael McNamara

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1878BornBaltimore
21 Jun 190223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Dec 192749.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
19 Dec 192749.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
29 Mar 192849.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Eumenia
15 Nov 194769.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
26 Nov 196082.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA

MicroData Summary for John Michael McNamara:
Bishop John Michael McNamara (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Washington

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013