Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Joseph Faraud, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta

Titular Bishop of Anemurium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Mar 1823BornGigondas, France
8 May 184724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 May 186340.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada
16 May 186340.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Anemurium
30 Nov 186340.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anemurium
26 Sep 189067.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Henri Joseph Faraud:
Bishop Henri Joseph Faraud O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Athabaska Mackenzie

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013