Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Denis-Marie-Dieudonné Le Hardy du Marais

Deceased

Bishop of Laval


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1833BornValenciennes
20 Dec 185624.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 187643.4SelectedBishop of Laval, France
26 Jun 187643.5ConfirmedBishop of Laval, France
24 Sep 187643.7Ordained BishopBishop of Laval, France
20 Jun 188653.5DiedBishop of Laval, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Denis-Marie-Dieudonné Le Hardy du Marais:
Bishop Jules-Denis-Marie-Dieudonné Le Hardy du Marais (born , died ) Bishop of Laval

  • a priest for 29.5 years
  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 579

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013