Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hector-Albert Chaulet d’Outremont

Deceased

Bishop of Le Mans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1825BornTours
22 Dec 185530.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Mar 185631.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 187145.9SelectedBishop of Agen, France
24 Feb 187146.0ConfirmedBishop of Agen, France
19 Mar 187146.1Ordained BishopBishop of Agen, France
21 Sep 187449.6SelectedBishop of Le Mans, France
21 Dec 187449.8ConfirmedBishop of Le Mans, France
14 Sep 188459.6DiedBishop of Le Mans, France

MicroData Summary for Hector-Albert Chaulet d’Outremont:
Bishop Hector-Albert Chaulet d’Outremont (born , died ) Bishop of Le Mans

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 13.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013