Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-André-Xavier de Gaffory

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1810Born
24 Jun 183626.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 187261.6SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
6 May 187261.8ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
6 Oct 187262.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
14 Jul 187767.0DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for François-André-Xavier de Gaffory
Bishop François-André-Xavier de Gaffory (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorte
Ordained BishopLazaristes-95, rue de Sevres, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 41.0 years
  • a bishop for 4.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 75
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1872, Number 97

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast