Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio-Maria Casabianca

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1775³BornGenova
2 Jun 179822.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Feb 181943.3SelectedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
29 Mar 181943.4ConfirmedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
13 Apr 181943.4Ordained BishopBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
29 Jan 182852.2ResignedBishop of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy
4 May 184872.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio-Maria Casabianca:
Bishop Antonio-Maria Casabianca (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Galtelli-Nuoro (Galtelly Nori)

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1837
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013