Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Cesarei Leoni

Deceased

Bishop of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1757BornPerugia
25 Aug 179740.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Aug 179740.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 181659.2Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
28 Jul 181659.6Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jul 181659.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
28 Jul 181760.6AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
24 Aug 181760.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
25 Jul 183073.6DiedBishop of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cesarei Leoni:
Cardinal Francesco Cesarei Leoni (born , died ) Bishop of Jesi

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.9 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013