Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Maria Cipriani, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jul 1773BornNorcia
21 May 179622.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
26 Sep 181441.2AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
2 Oct 181441.2Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
28 Dec 184370.4DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Cipriani:
Bishop Francesco Maria Cipriani O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 394

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013